Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc. v. Bra-Nu Enterprise, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc.
Defendant: Bra-Nu Enterprise, LLC and individually doing business as Evanston Marathon doing business as Pleasant Ridge Marathon, Berhanu Abebe and individually doing business as Queensgate Marathon doing business as Victory Marathon doing business as Ehtio Gas Food Mart doing business as Reading Marathon and Minoleah Enterprises LLC and individually doing business as BP West Mitchell doing business as Minoleah, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00137
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc.. Minoleah Enterprises LLC served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Martin, Phillip)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc.. Berhanu Abebe served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Martin, Phillip)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue filed by Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Martin, Phillip)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/15/20; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Howard D. Cade III. cc: Counsel(DJT)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants Berhanu Abebe, Bra-Nu Enterprise, LLC, Minoleah Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DJT)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Howard D. Cade III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 015287 by Defendants Berhanu Abebe, Bra-Nu Enterprise, LLC, Minoleah Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (DJT)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing for Exhibits to Complaint by Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Martin, Phillip)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/18/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Core-Mark International, Inc. for Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc.. (DJT)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Berhanu Abebe, Bra-Nu Enterprise, LLC, Minoleah Enterprises LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Bra-Nu, #2 Summons as to Minoleah) (DJT)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berhanu Abebe, Bra-Nu Enterprise, LLC, Minoleah Enterprises LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3164281., filed by Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc. v. Bra-Nu Enterprise, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bra-Nu Enterprise, LLC and individually doing business as Evanston Marathon doing business as Pleasant Ridge Marathon
Represented By: Howard D. Cade, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berhanu Abebe and individually doing business as Queensgate Marathon doing business as Victory Marathon doing business as Ehtio Gas Food Mart doing business as Reading Marathon
Represented By: Howard D. Cade, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minoleah Enterprises LLC and individually doing business as BP West Mitchell doing business as Minoleah, LLC
Represented By: Howard D. Cade, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip A. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?