Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Howard
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Defendant: James Robert Howard
Case Number: 4:2020cv00144
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Counterclaim by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Bass, Elizabeth)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrin W. Banks on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company (Banks, Darrin)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/6/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/10/2020. cc: counsel, KL (JM)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Nationwide General Insurance Company by James Robert Howard. (Caudill, John) Modified docket text to remove John Caudill as counterclaimant and defendant on 9/30/2020 (DJT).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/27/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide General Insurance Company. (DJT)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James Robert Howard. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Robert Howard Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3170889, filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Insurance Policy) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: John William Walters
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bass
Represented By: Darrin W. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robert Howard
Represented By: John L. Caudill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?