Owensboro Specialty Polymers, Inc. v. Daramic, LLC
Plaintiff: Owensboro Specialty Polymers, Inc.
Defendant: Daramic, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00163
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Owensboro Specialty Polymers, Inc. (VanVactor, Zachary)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 9/28/2020 granting #9 Proposed Agreed Order: The Temporary Restraining Order #8 is DISSOLVED. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by April A. Wimberg on behalf of Daramic, LLC (Wimberg, April)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order Dissolving TRO by Owensboro Specialty Polymers, Inc.. (VanVactor, Zachary)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 9/25/2020 granting #5 Motion for TRO. Pursuant to Rule 65(b), Daramic is TEMPORARILY ENJOINED and RESTRAINED from, directly or indirectly, whether alone or in concert with employees, affiliates, or others: (a) Refusing or failing to supply OSP and the OSP plant with utilities at the Owensboro facility; (b) Restricting OSP's access rights at the Owensboro facility, including access to the quality control laboratory located at the site; and (c) Otherwise restricting or prohibiting OSP from conducting operations on the premises of its Owensboro facility. This Temporary Restraining Order is effective at 12:05 PM CDT on 9/25/2020. Plaintiff's request for further injunctive relief during the pendency of this action shall be heard on 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Owensboro Courtroom before Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley Jr.. Plaintiff shall provide notice of this Temporary Restraining Order and hearing date to Defendant. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Support Agreement & Related Contract Documents by Owensboro Specialty Polymers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Support Agreement & Related Contract Documents) (VanVactor, Zachary)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 9/25/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (DJT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Owensboro Specialty Polymers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (DJT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Borchers Americas, Inc. for Owensboro Specialty Polymers, Inc.. (DJT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Daramic, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daramic, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3192614., filed by Owensboro Specialty Polymers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)
September 25, 2020 COURT PROCEEDINGS held before Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2020. (No Court Reporter) (EAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owensboro Specialty Polymers, Inc. v. Daramic, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owensboro Specialty Polymers, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daramic, LLC
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?