United States of America v. Iverson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Breanna S. Iverson, Any Unknown Spouse of Barbra A. Iverson, Any Unknown Spouse of Breanna S. Iverson, Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of Barbra A. Iverson and Personal Finance Company
Not Classified By Court: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 4:2020cv00164
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/10/20; granting #7 Warning Order: Attorney Matthew C. Tierney for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel, Defendants (DJT)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Any Unknown Spouse of Breanna S. Iverson, as heir of Barbra A. Iverson; Any Unknown Spouse of Barbra A. Iverson and Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of Barbra A. Iverson by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Breanna S. Iverson served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. (Campbell, William)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Personal Finance Company served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Campbell, William)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/1/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Breanna S. Iverson, Personal Finance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Personal Finance Company, #2 Summons as to Personal Finance Company) (DJT)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of Barbra A. Iverson, Any Unknown Spouse of Barbra A. Iverson, Any Unknown Spouse of Breanna S. Iverson, Breanna S. Iverson, Personal Finance Company, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #5 Exhibit D-Assumption Agreement, #6 Exhibit E- Judgment Lien) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Iverson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breanna S. Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Spouse of Barbra A. Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Spouse of Breanna S. Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of Barbra A. Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personal Finance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Matthew C. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?