Chapman v. Henderson County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Wayne Chapman
Defendant: Amy Brady, Mail Clerk Officer Hunt, Officer Vowels, Henderson County Detention Center and Captain Magilfresh
Case Number: 4:2021cv00002
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Plaintiff Ronald Wayne Chapman. (EAS)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EBOC) on 1/29/2021 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that Henderson County Detention Center is directed to collect fee from inmate account. Clerk is directed to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. cc: Plaintiff, pro se, USDC WD/KY Financial Section, HCDC Inmate Accts.(EAS)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL #1 Complaint by Ronald Wayne Chapman. (EAS) Modified on 1/22/2021 (EAS).
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald Wayne Chapman. (DJT)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ronald Wayne Chapman (DJT)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amy Brady, Henderson County Detention Center, Hunt, Magilfresh, Vowels, filed by Ronald Wayne Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Henderson County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mail Clerk Officer Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Vowels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Magilfresh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Wayne Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?