Fulcher et al v. Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Chase Fulcher LLC and Chase Fulcher
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00028
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chase Fulcher LLC, Chase Fulcher. (Sigler, James)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY re #8 Counterclaim filed by Chase Fulcher LLC, Chase Fulcher. (Sigler, James)
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Johnson, Lira)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Johnson, Lira)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Johnson, Lira)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chase Fulcher, Chase Fulcher LLC. Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Receipt return receipt of certified mail) (Sigler, James)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Omitted Exhibit by Chase Fulcher LLC, Chase Fulcher re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit letter) (Sigler, James)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (EAS)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/17/2021: This action is hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for determination of nondispositive matters, pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate Judge is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. IT IS SO ORDERED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-HBB (EAS)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (EAS)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3306481., filed by Chase Fulcher, Chase Fulcher LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit KFB Contract, #2 Exhibit SFB Contract, #3 Cover Sheet) (EAS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2021: #4 Summons) (EAS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulcher et al v. Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Fulcher LLC
Represented By: James A. Sigler
Represented By: David L. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Fulcher
Represented By: James A. Sigler
Represented By: David L. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Tanner Watkins
Represented By: Lira A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?