Greenhouse Holdings, LLC v. International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 91
Plaintiff: Greenhouse Holdings, LLC
Defendant: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 91
Case Number: 4:2021cv00029
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Vacate Arbitrator's Supplemental Award by Plaintiff Greenhouse Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Greenhouse formation, #3 Exhibit B - Greenhouse Interest Transfer, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Dan Kinney, #5 Exhibit D - Clearview TN Formation, #6 Exhibit E - Clearview TN Interest Transfer, #7 Exhibit F - Asset Purchase Agreement, #8 Exhibit G - Second CBA, #9 Exhibit H - Negotiation Letter) (Martin, Robert)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 5/11/2021 granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kera L. Paoff, counsel for International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 91. cc: Counsel(EAS)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Kera L. Paoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid $125 Receipt No. L33066849 by Defendant International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 91 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (EAS)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Kera Paoff re #9 Waiver of Service Executed.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/20/2021. (KJA)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Greenhouse Holdings, LLC. International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 91 waiver sent on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Martin, Robert)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 3/29/2021 granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas W. Shumate, IV, counsel for Plaintiff, Greenhouse Holdings, LLC. cc: Counsel(EAS)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 3/29/2021 granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert D. Martin, counsel for Plaintiff, Greenhouse Holdings, LLC. cc: Counsel(EAS)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/29/2021: This action is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for determination of nondispositive matters, pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate Judge is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. IT IS SO ORDERED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel; CM-HBB (EAS)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Thomas W. Shumate IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125 #L33066481 by Plaintiff Greenhouse Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DJT)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Robert D. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125 #L33066481 by Plaintiff Greenhouse Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DJT)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 91. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 91 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number l33066481, filed by Greenhouse Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (DJT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2021: #4 Cover Sheet) (DJT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenhouse Holdings, LLC v. International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 91
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 91
Represented By: Kera L. Paoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenhouse Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Martin
Represented By: Thomas W. Shumate, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?