Daniels v. Crean et al
Plaintiff: Danny Daniels
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Crete Carrier Corporation, James Crean and Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 4:2021cv00031
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPOINTMENT OF WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 5/12/2021 granting #8 Warning Order. Attorney Jonathon P. Coomes is appointed to correspond with said Defendant James Crean, and to inform him by mail concerning the pendency and nature of this action, and to file his report with the Clerk within 50 days after entry of this Order. cc: Counsel(EAS)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing proposed order by Danny Daniels re #8 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment (Griffith, D.) Modified docket text on 5/6/2021 (EAS).
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment by Plaintiff Danny Daniels (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Griffith, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2021: #2 Proposed Order) (EAS).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AGAINST STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE COMPANY AND PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 4/1/2021: IT IS ORDERED: 1) Plaintiff's claims against Defendants STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE COMPANY and PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, their agents, employees, representatives or affiliates, brought in the Complaint or which could have brought, are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. 2) Defendants, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE COMPANY and PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY crossclaims against Defendants JAMES CREAN and CRETE CARRIER CORPORATION are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. 3) Future pleadings shall exclude Defendants STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE COMPANY and PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY as a party in the caption. 4) All other claims of Plaintiffs against any other party or Defendant are reserved. cc:counsel (EAS)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Andrews, Jennifer)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Webster Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/25/21: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crete Carrier Corporation. (DJT)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWERS FILED] by Crete Carrier Corporation, James Crean from Webster Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00004. Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0644-3312291, filed by Crete Carrier Corporation, James Crean. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2-Crean and Crete Answer, #4 Exhibit 3-Pltf's Answers to Crean and Crete Ints, #5 Exhibit 4-Progressive Answer to Complaint and Crossclaim, #6 Exhibit 5-State Farm Answer and Crossclaim) (DJT)
March 25, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against James Crean, Crete Carrier Corporation by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Filed in Webster Circuit Court (See DN #1 -6) (DJT)
March 25, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against James Crean, Crete Carrier Corporation by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. Filed in Webster Circuit Court (DN #1 -5) (DJT)
March 25, 2021 ANSWER filed in Webster Circuit Court with Jury Demand by James Crean, Crete Carrier Corporation. (See DN #1 -3 (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Crean et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Mitchell Deep, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen D. Gray
Represented By: Stephen M. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Crean
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Jonathon P. Coomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Daniels
Represented By: D. Joe Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?