Sterett et al v. TBM Carriers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Katherine E. Sterett, William L. Sterett, IV, Maxwell Braden Sterett, John Reid Sterett and Estate of Issac Andrew Sterett
3Rd Party Plaintiff: TBM Carriers, Inc., Roberto Ignacio M. Enriquez and Jose Alberto T. Goxcon
3Rd Party Defendant: John Doe Individuals 1-3, John Doe Companies 4-6, Sterett Companies, LLC, PGP Exotic Auto Sales, Inc. and William L Sterett, III
Case Number: 4:2021cv00079
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
2 Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 mv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court grants Sterret Companies, LLC's extension to file an answer to November 5, 2021 based on the agreement of all the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order by Sterett Companies, LLC. (Fauth, Lisa) Modified on 9/23/2021 to change event/docket text to "proposed agreed order." (JM).
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendants PGP Exotic Auto Sales, Inc., Sterett Companies, LLC and William L Sterett, III. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Third-Party Defendant Sterett Companies, #2 Summons issued to Third-Party Defendant William L. Sterett III) (JM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Sterett Companies, LLC, PGP Exotic Auto Sales, Inc., William L Sterett, III, John Doe Defendants 1-3, John Doe Companies 4-6 by Jose Alberto T. Goxcon, TBM Carriers, Inc., Roberto Ignacio M. Enriquez. (Attachments: #1 Summons PGP Exotic Auto Sales, Inc. Summons on Third-Party Complaint, #2 Summons Sterett Companies Summons on Third-Party Complaint, #3 Summons William L. Sterett III Summons on Third-Party Complaint) (Janik, Steven) Modified on 8/18/2021 to add additional Third-Party Defendants (JM).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to General Order No. 2020-27, the instant action is REASSIGNED to the docket of Judge Benjamin Beaton for final disposition. cc:counsel; CM-BB (EAS)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Ohio Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/11/21: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TBM Carriers, Inc.. (DJT)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Jose Alberto T. Goxcon, TBM Carriers, Inc., Roberto Ignacio M. Enriquez from Ohio Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00185. Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0644-3398735, filed by Jose Alberto T. Goxcon, TBM Carriers, Inc., Roberto Ignacio M. Enriquez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings from Estate of Issac Andrew Sterett, et al. v. TBM) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterett et al v. TBM Carriers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine E. Sterett
Represented By: John David Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Sterett, IV
Represented By: John David Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell Braden Sterett
Represented By: John David Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Reid Sterett
Represented By: John David Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Issac Andrew Sterett
Represented By: John David Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: TBM Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Steven G. Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Roberto Ignacio M. Enriquez
Represented By: Steven G. Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jose Alberto T. Goxcon
Represented By: Steven G. Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John Doe Individuals 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John Doe Companies 4-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sterett Companies, LLC
Represented By: Lisa J. Fauth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: PGP Exotic Auto Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: William L Sterett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?