Spurlin v. Kromer et al
Plaintiff: Steven Cole Spurlin
Defendant: Cody Krouer, Bob Winters, Deputy Roush and Cody Kromer
Case Number: 4:2021cv00106
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Steven Cole Spurlin (EAS)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of WAIVER OF SERVICE by Cody Kromer, Bob Winters (Bevins, Samantha)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Cody Kromer, Bob Winters. (Bevins, Samantha)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 12/3/2021 for the Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel, to Show Cause within 14 days of entry of this Order why it has failed to comply with the Court's Service and Scheduling Order. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants Kromer and Winters; General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel (EAS)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/17/2021: Plaintiff has filed a letter #12 which the Court construes as a motion for legal advice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion #12 is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet and three motion forms. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants; Hopkins Co. Atty; General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel (EAS)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiff Steven Cole Spurlin. (EAS)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Cole Spurlin. Roush served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (EAS)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed (date not provided) as to Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel. (EAS)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF CERTIFIED MAILING from the Court (return receipt requested) re #7 Order re service on Justice & Public Safety Cabinet. (EAS)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Roush. Service packet e-mailed to US Marshal as instructed. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (EAS)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/22/2021 - IT IS ORDERED as follows: Clerk shall issue summons for Defendant Roush and the US Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint #1 , the separate Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date #6 , the instant Order, and summons on Defendant Roush in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A copy of these documents shall also be mailed to the Hopkins County Attorney. The Clerk shall forward by certified mail, return receipt requested, one copy of the complaint #1 , the separate Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date #6 , and the instant Order to the Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel, Frankfort, KY. (*See order for specific content.) Discovery due by 2/18/2022. Plaintiff's Pre-trial Memorandum due by 3/21/2022. Defendants' Pre-trial Memorandum due by 4/21/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/21/2022. Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Prisoner Handbook. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants (as directed above); Hopkins County Attorney (as directed above); General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel (as directed above) (EAS)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/22/2021: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's official-capacity claims against Defendants Kromer and Winters are dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff's official-capacity claim against Defendant Roush, his 8th Amendment claims, and his claims for injunctive relief are dismissed. Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff both a 28:2241 and 28:2254 packet for his use should he decided to file a habeas corpus action. The Court will enter a separate Service and Scheduling Order.cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants; General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel; Hopkins County Attorney (EAS)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EBOC) on 10/21/2021 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350 under an installment plan. IT IS ORDERED the Hopkins County Jail shall collect from the Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350 filing fee (*see Order for specific content). The Clerk is directed to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Financial Section USDC WDKY; HCJ, Attn: Inmate Accounts(EAS)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Steven Cole Spurlin. (DJT)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Steven Cole Spurlin (DJT)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cody Krouer, Roush, Bob Winters, filed by Steven Cole Spurlin. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spurlin v. Kromer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Cole Spurlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Krouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Winters
Represented By: Samantha A. Bevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Kromer
Represented By: Samantha A. Bevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?