Dinwiddie v. Dinwiddie
Plaintiff: Zachary Dinwiddie
Defendant: James Dinwiddie, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00068
Filed: June 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 nr Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/1/2022: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that for the reasons articulated by Plaintiff, along with Defendant's withdrawal of his notice of removal, Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Remand is granted. The case is REMANDED to the Grayson District Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions are denied as moot. The Court waives Defendant's payment of the filing fee or application to proceed without prepayment of fees as this case is now closed. cc: Counsel; Defendant, pro se; Grayson District Court(EAS)
June 23, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel, Defendant (pro se), Grayson District Court (SRH)
June 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Filing fee not paid or Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/25/2022. (SRH)
June 17, 2022 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by James Dinwiddie, Jr.. (SRH)
June 14, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) & Memo in Support Thereof filed by Zachary Dinwiddie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Dismiss) (Sullivan, Ronald)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE 12 (b) filed by Defendant James Dinwiddie, Jr. (MNM)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand Notice of Removal by Plaintiff Zachary Dinwiddie (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - 2/27/13 Order, #3 Exhibit B - Petition for Probate of Will, #4 Exhibit C - First Amended Inventory, #5 Proposed Order) (Sullivan, Ronald)
June 7, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley Jr.. (SRH)
June 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Dinwiddie, Jr. from Grayson County District Court, case number 12-P-0039. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court filings) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dinwiddie v. Dinwiddie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Dinwiddie
Represented By: Ronald M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dinwiddie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?