Hopkins County School District v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hopkins County School District
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Meta Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Siculus, Inc., Snap Inc., TikTok Inc., ByteDance Inc., Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, XXVI Holdings Inc. and YouTube, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00053
Filed: April 20, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
2 Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Remark: Case transferred from Kentucky Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 4:23-cv-02313, filed 05/11/2023. (KJA)
May 11, 2023 Filing 20 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 9 from ND/CA re MDL 3047. (KJA)
May 11, 2023 Case transferred to District of ND/CA. Case electronically transferred. (KJA)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to GO 23-06, this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Benjamin Beaton for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel; CM-BB (EAS)
May 8, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. Meta Payments, Inc. served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 8, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. Facebook Technologies, LLC served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 8, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. TikTok Inc. served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 8, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. Snap Inc. served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 8, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 8, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. ByteDance Inc. served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 5, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. YouTube, LLC served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 5, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. Siculus, Inc. served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 2, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. Facebook Holdings, LLC served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 2, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. Instagram, LLC served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 1, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hopkins County School District. XXVI Holdings Inc. served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023. (Johnson, Ronald)
April 20, 2023 Filing 7 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Hopkins County School District. (Johnson, Ronald)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 4/20/23: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
April 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/27/2023. (DJT)
April 20, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Hopkins County School District. (DJT)
April 20, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., ByteDance Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Technologies, LLC, Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap Inc., TikTok Inc., XXVI Holdings Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to ByteDance Summons, #2 Summons as to Facebook Holdings, #3 Summons as to Facebook Operations, #4 Summons as to Facebook Technologies, #5 Summons as to Google, #6 Summons as to Instagram, #7 Summons as to Meta Payments, #8 Summons as to Meta Platforms, #9 Summons as to Siculus, #10 Summons as to Snap, #11 Summons as to XXVI Holdings, #12 Summons as to YouTube, #13 Summons as to TikTok) (DJT)
April 20, 2023 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
April 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY TRIAL DEMAND against Alphabet Inc., ByteDance Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Technologies, LLC, Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap Inc., TikTok Inc., XXVI Holdings Inc., YouTube, LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AKYWDC-3791709., filed by Hopkins County School District. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins County School District v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hopkins County School District
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Payments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siculus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XXVI Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?