Cox v. Huddleston et al
Plaintiff: Claude Cox
Defendant: Hobert Huddleston, Greg Howard and Thomas L. Simpson
Case Number: 5:2009cv00046
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Lyon
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/18/2011; re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Byron Jisis, Greg Howard, Thomas L. Simpson, Hobert Huddleston ; an appropriate order shall entercc:counsel (KJA)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/23/2010; re 18 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Byron Jisis, Greg Howard, Thomas L. Simpson, Hobert Huddleston ; an appropriate order shall issuecc:counsel (KJA)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/29/09. cc:counsel (KJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Huddleston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobert Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?