Cox v. Riley
Plaintiff: Claude R. Cox, Jr.
Defendant: Johnathan Riley
Case Number: 5:2010cv00121
Filed: June 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Paducah Office
County: Lyon
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/3/2011: re DN 31 ; an appropriate judgment enteredcc:counsel (KJA)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/24/2010. cc:counsel (KJA)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM & ORDER by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/30/2010: Clerk of Court shall forward by certified mail return receipt one copy of the complaint and this order to Justice & Public Safety Cabinet; Discovery due by 11/12/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 1/12/2011. Plaintiff pre-trial memorandum due by 12/13/2010. Defendants Pre-trial Memorandum due by 1/12/2011.cc:counsel (KJA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude R. Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?