Pacheco v. Waldrop et al

Plaintiff: Shawnda Pacheco
Defendant: Nancy Waldrop and Victor Zimmerman
Case Number: 5:2013cv00044
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Paducah Office
County: McCracken
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 3 Motion for TRO. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/10/2013. cc:counsel (KJA)
December 9, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/9/2014. cc: Counsel(KJA)
February 5, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 35 Motion for Reconsideration re 33 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 2/3/2015. cc: Counsel(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacheco v. Waldrop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnda Pacheco
Represented By: Thomas L. Osborne(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Waldrop
Represented By: Gorman Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Regina A. Jackson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael A. Owsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Zimmerman
Represented By: Gorman Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Regina A. Jackson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael A. Owsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.