Wenzel v. Ingram Barge Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Wenzel
Defendant: Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc. and Ingram Barge Company, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00181
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas E. Gossow on behalf of Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc. (Gossow, Douglas)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ingram Barge Company, LLC. (Marshall, Carl)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/11/2019. Granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Douglas E. Gossow. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(KJA)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Douglas E. Gossow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc. Filing fee $ 125, receipt no. P33003974. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (KJA)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ingram Barge Company, LLC. (Marshall, Carl)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Marshall on behalf of Ingram Barge Company, LLC (Marshall, Carl)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc. and Ingram Barge Company, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc. and Ingram Barge Company, LLC, filed by Christopher Wenzel. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wenzel v. Ingram Barge Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitzgerald Marine & Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Gossow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingram Barge Company, LLC
Represented By: Carl J. Marshall
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wenzel
Represented By: Gregory E. H. Smith
Represented By: Willard B. Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?