Tucker v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Charles D. Tucker
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv00194
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/11/2019. Granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice William B. Wahlheim, Jr.. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel(KJA)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2782339. by Defendant Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency William B. Wahlheim, Jr. re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: PHV motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/18/2019. (KJA)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency Grace R. Murphy re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: PHV motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/18/2019. (KJA)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/2/2019. Defendant's responsive pleading deadline is 2/1/2019.cc:counsel (KJA)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Calloway Circuit Court (MNM)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company from Calloway Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00410 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2774229). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Grace R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D. Tucker
Represented By: Michael M. Pitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?