Glenn E. Daulton, Inc. v. Everest Contracting, LLC

Plaintiff: Glenn E. Daulton, Inc.
Defendant: Everest Contracting, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00063
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Glenn E. Daulton, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Carl J. Marshall, #2 Proposed Order Entry of Default) (Marshall, Carl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glenn E. Daulton, Inc.. Everest Contracting, LLC served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (Marshall, Carl)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Everest Contracting, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glenn E. Daulton, Inc. (MNM)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Everest Contracting, LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2854691, filed by Glenn E. Daulton, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bareboat Barge Charter Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn E. Daulton, Inc. v. Everest Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn E. Daulton, Inc.
Represented By: Carl J. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?