Madden v. Grate et al

Plaintiff: William Joseph Madden
Defendant: Amy Fisher, DeEdra Hart, Travis Bradley, Michael Spindler and Jonathan Grate
Case Number: 5:2019cv00073
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff William Joseph Madden (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit) (KJA)
July 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Enforce Order by Plaintiff William Joseph Madden (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KJA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Plaintiff William Joseph Madden (Attachments: #1 Response to Petition filed in State Court) (KJA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Travis Bradley, Amy Fisher, Jonathan Grate, DeEdra Hart, Michael Spindler. (Bizzell, Mark)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amy Fisher, Michael Spindler, DeEdra Hart, Jonathan Grate, Travis Bradley. Amy Fisher waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Michael Spindler waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; DeEdra Hart waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Jonathan Grate waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Travis Bradley waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Bizzell, Mark)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William Joseph Madden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KJA)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Oral Arguments by Plaintiff William Joseph Madden (KJA)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Travis Bradley, Amy Fisher, Jonathan Grate, DeEdra Hart, Michael Spindler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Movements, #2 Exhibit Correspondence, #3 Exhibit Portective Custody Refusals, #4 Proposed Order) (Dunham, Angela)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Case by Plaintiff William Joseph Madden (KJA)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to Justice & Public Safety Cabinet. (KJA)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 Letter by William Joseph Madden requesting that case not be published. (KJA)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/23/2019. The Clerk of Court shall forward by certified mail one copy of the Complaint (DN #1 ), the Memorandum Opinion and Order, and the instant Order to the Justice & Public Safety Cabinet. General Counsel shall have 30 days to complete and return a notice of waiver of service for Defendants. Pretrial discovery due by 9/19/2019. Plaintiff's pretrial memorandum due 10/21/2019. Defendants' pretrial memorandum due 11/18/2019. Dispositive motions due 11/18/2019. Plaintiff is WARNED that failure to notify the Clerk of Court any address change or failure to comply with this or any subsequent order MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a copy of the pro se Prisoner Handbook. Discovery due by 9/19/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2019. Pre-trial Memorandum due by 11/18/2019.cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants (as directed); General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet (JWM)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/23/2019. Defendants shall file a response to the motion for preliminary injunction (DN #6 ) within 14 days from entry of this Order. Plaintiff may file a reply within 14 days of service of Defendants' response. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Defendants a copy of Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. cc:Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants; General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet (JWM)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/23/2019. The Plaintiff's official-capacity claims for damages are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court will enter a separate Service and Scheduling Order to govern the claims allowed to continue. cc: Plaintiff; Defendants; General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet (JWM)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell (EBOC)on 5/22/2019 granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $10.10 will be assessed. The Kentucky State Penitentiary is required to sent the Clerk of the Court the initial partial filing fee and thereafter payments each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to open an account for the payment of the filing fee. cc: Plaintiff, Finance, KSP(JWM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Emergency Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff William Joseph Madden. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (MNM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Joseph Madden. (MNM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William Joseph Madden. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (MNM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRELIMINARY MEMORANDUM by William Joseph Madden. (MNM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travis Bradley, Amy Fisher, Jonathan Grate, DeEdra Hart, and Michael Spindler, filed by William Joseph Madden. (Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered, #2 Mailing Envelope) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madden v. Grate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Fisher
Represented By: Mark F. Bizzell
Represented By: Angela T. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeEdra Hart
Represented By: Mark F. Bizzell
Represented By: Angela T. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Bradley
Represented By: Mark F. Bizzell
Represented By: Angela T. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Spindler
Represented By: Mark F. Bizzell
Represented By: Angela T. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Grate
Represented By: Mark F. Bizzell
Represented By: Angela T. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Joseph Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?