Clark v. Jameson et al
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Clark, Jr.
Defendant: Calloway County Public Defender's Office, Commonwealth Attorney's Office of Murray, KY, Attorney Cheri Riedell, Judge James T. Jameson, Ken Claud, James Burkeen and Angel Clere
Case Number: 5:2019cv00074
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/20/2019. Granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, pro se, Financial Section, USDC, WDKY, Calloway County Jail, Attn: Inmate Accounts, 310 N. 4th Street, Murray, KY 42071(KJA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against James T. Jameson, James Burkeen, Ken Claud, Angel Clere filed by Jerry L. Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KJA) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/19/2019) (KJA).
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jerry L. Clark, Jr. (KJA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jerry L. Clark, Jr (KJA)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/21/2019 re #1 Complaint filed by Jerry L. Clark, Jr. Plaintiff shall within 30 days of entry of this Order file an amended complaint on the 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form and prepare a summons for each Defendant. Plaintiff shall within 30 days of entry of this Order either pay the $400 filing fee or file a prisoner application to proceed without prepayment of fees along with a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (with 1983 complaint form, four summons forms, and prisoner application to proceed without prepayment of fees) (CDF)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calloway County Public Defender's Office, Commonwealth Attorney's Office of Murray, KY, James T. Jameson, and Cheri Riedell, filed by Jerry L. Clark, Jr. (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Jameson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calloway County Public Defender's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Attorney's Office of Murray, KY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Cheri Riedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge James T. Jameson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Claud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Burkeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Clere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?