Bushansky v. HopFed Bancorp, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Bushansky
Defendant: Harry J. Dempsey, Steve Hunt, Richard H. Perkins, Thomas I. Miller, Ted S. Kinsey, Michael L. Woolfolk, John E. Peck, Mark D. Alcott and HopFed Bancorp, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00084
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/24/2019. Action is DISMISSED from the docket pursuant to #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. All deadlines and motions are vacated/cancelled. cc: Counsel (CDF)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE of email confirmation as to George Carter re #20 Request for Fee Refund. (MLG)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stephen Bushansky (Strause, Randall)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 Request for Fee Refund re 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Attachments: #1 Receipt Payment Confirmation 7-9-19, #2 Receipt Payment Confirmation 7-12-19) by HopFed Bancorp, Inc.. (Carter, George)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/15/2019. Granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert B. Bieck, Jr. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel(KJA)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Robert B. Bieck, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2901819. by Defendant HopFed Bancorp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement) (Carter, George)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by George M. Carter on behalf of defendants (Carter, George) Modified on 7/10/2019 to edit docket text (KJA).
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Mark D. Alcott, Harry J. Dempsey, HopFed Bancorp, Inc., Steve Hunt, Ted S. Kinsey, Thomas I. Miller, John E. Peck, Richard H. Perkins, Michael L. Woolfolk (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support OMITTED IN ERROR FROM DOCKET ENTRY 15, #2 Exhibit Proxy Statement HopFed Bancorp, Inc., #3 Exhibit Compilation of Bushansky Docket Sheets, #4 Exhibit HopFed Articles of Incorporation) (Breckinridge, Alexander)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Mark D. Alcott, Harry J. Dempsey, HopFed Bancorp, Inc., Steve Hunt, Ted S. Kinsey, Thomas I. Miller, John E. Peck, Richard H. Perkins, Michael L. Woolfolk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proxy Statement HopFed Bancorp, Inc., #2 Exhibit Compilation of Bushansky Docket Sheets, #3 Exhibit HopFed Articles of Incorporation) (Breckinridge, Alexander)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Michael L. Woolfolk waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Strause, Randall)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Richard H. Perkins waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Strause, Randall)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. John E. Peck waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Strause, Randall)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Thomas I. Miller waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Strause, Randall)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Ted S. Kinsey waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Strause, Randall)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Steve Hunt waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Strause, Randall)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Harry J. Dempsey waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Strause, Randall)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Mark D. Alcott waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Strause, Randall)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. HopFed Bancorp, Inc. waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Strause, Randall)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/28/2019. Granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexander N. Breckinridge, V. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(KJA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Alexander N. Breckinridge, V to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Mark D. Alcott, Harry J. Dempsey, HopFed Bancorp, Inc., Steve Hunt, Ted S. Kinsey, Thomas I. Miller, John E. Peck, Richard H. Perkins, Michael L. Woolfolk. Filing fee $ 125. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt, #3 Proposed Order) (KJA)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark D. Alcott, Harry J. Dempsey, HopFed Bancorp, Inc., Steve Hunt, Ted S. Kinsey, Thomas I. Miller, John E. Peck, Richard H. Perkins, and Michael L. Woolfolk. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark D. Alcott, Harry J. Dempsey, HopFed Bancorp, Inc., Steve Hunt, Ted S. Kinsey, Thomas I. Miller, John E. Peck, Richard H. Perkins, and Michael L. Woolfolk. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2882793, filed by Stephen Bushansky. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Certification) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bushansky v. HopFed Bancorp, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry J. Dempsey
Represented By: Alexander Negus Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hunt
Represented By: Alexander Negus Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Perkins
Represented By: Alexander Negus Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas I. Miller
Represented By: Alexander Negus Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted S. Kinsey
Represented By: Alexander Negus Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Woolfolk
Represented By: Alexander Negus Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Peck
Represented By: Alexander Negus Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Alcott
Represented By: Alexander Negus Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HopFed Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Negus Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bushansky
Represented By: Randall S. Strause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?