In The Matter of the Complaint of Clinton Auto Parts, Inc., as Title Owner, and Integrity Marine Management, LLC
Petitioner: In The Matter of the Complaint of Clinton Auto Parts, Inc., as Title Owner, and Integrity Marine Management, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00100
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY re #4 Order (KJA)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing and Request for Clerk to Issue Notice by In The Matter of the Complaint of Clinton Auto Parts, Inc., as Title Owner, and Integrity Marine Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability) (Miller, Bobby)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR AD INTERIM STIPULATION AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING SUITS by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/24/2019. cc: Counsel; Finance (CDF)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Clinton Auto Parts, Inc. and Integrity Marine Management, LLC. (MNM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY filed by Petitioner In The Matter of the Complaint of Clinton Auto Parts, Inc., as Title Owner, and Integrity Marine Management, LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2905308. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Verification - Clinton Auto Parts, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - Verification - Integrity Marine Management, LLC, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Value, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter of Undertaking, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter of the Complaint of Clinton Auto Parts, Inc., as Title Owner, and Integrity Marine Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In The Matter of the Complaint of Clinton Auto Parts, Inc., as Title Owner, and Integrity Marine Management, LLC
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?