Jones v. The Bank of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Candy Jones
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC, The Bank of Missouri, Trans Union, LLC, Credit One Bank, N.A., Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00103
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #17 Corporate Disclosure Statement ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Williams, John)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/6/2019) (KJA).
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Credit One Bank, N.A. by Candy Jones (Lawson, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. (Main, Marisa)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/21/2019. Granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian D. Roth. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel(KJA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support by Defendants LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tucker, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Sherman Originator, LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC; Corporate Parent Alegis Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Resurgent Holdings, LLC for Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. by LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. (Tucker, Joseph)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Brian D. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2924920. by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brian D. Roth, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit List of Admissions, #4 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Danielle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CL Holdings, LLC for Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Lewis, Danielle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Lewis, Danielle)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Credit One Bank, N.A.. Credit One Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Jackson, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Credit One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., The Bank of Missouri, and Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., The Bank of Missouri, and Trans Union, LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2906767, filed by Candy Jones. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. The Bank of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: Marisa E. Main
Represented By: Joseph N. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sandra D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Represented By: Danielle J. Lewis
Represented By: Brian D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Represented By: Marisa E. Main
Represented By: Joseph N. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Jones
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?