Jones v. H & J Restaurants, LLC
Plaintiff: Devan Jones
Defendant: H & J Restaurants, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00105
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:021
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION AND FOR THE ISSUANCE OF COURT-SUPERVISED NOTICE by Plaintiff Devan Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed FLSA Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Consent Form, #3 Memorandum in Support - MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION AND FOR THE ISSUANCE OF COURT-SUPERVISED NOTICE, #4 Proposed Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION AND AUTHORIZING COURT-APPROVED NOTICE, #5 Affidavit - DECLARATION OF DEVAN JONES, #6 Affidavit - DECLARATION OF LATISA MARTIN) (Garrison, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by H & J Restaurants, LLC. (Denton, Glenn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Devan Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form) (Garrison, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Devan Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form) (Garrison, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn D. Denton on behalf of H & J Restaurants, LLC (Denton, Glenn)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/9/2019. Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua A. Frank. cc: Counsel(KJA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Joshua A. Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2920084. by Plaintiff Devan Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing for Joshua A. Frank) (Frank, Joshua) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/9/2019) (MNM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (MNM).
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Devan Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form) (Garrison, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devan Jones. H & J Restaurants, LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Garrison, David)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Devan Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form) (Garrison, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to H & J Restaurants, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against H & J Restaurants, LLC, filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2908076, filed by Devan Jones. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. H & J Restaurants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devan Jones
Represented By: Joshua A. Frank
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & J Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Glenn D. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?