Bonds v. Darling Ingredients, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Bonds
Defendant: Darling Ingredients, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00118
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/20/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2020., Daubert Motion due by 8/15/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2020., Expert Discovery due by 8/15/2020., Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 6/30/2020., Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 4/30/2020., Fact Discovery due by 3/30/2020., Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Jury Trial set for 11/30/2020 at 9:00 AM in Paducah Courtroom before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. cc:counsel, CM-King (KJA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Darling Ingredients, Inc.. (Winchell, Elizabeth)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David Bonds. (Dettman, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/5/2019. IT IS ORDERED:1. Counsel who will represent the parties at trial and who have full authority to enter stipulations, to make admissions, and to bind the parties with respect to dates agreed upon or ordered shall be available for a TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 20, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. CENTRAL TIME. The Court will place the call to counsel.2. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. counsel shall discuss and establish a discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court at the scheduling conference either orally during the telephonic conference or in writing. Counsel are directed to make the mandatory disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(l) Fed.R.Civ.P. by said conference date.3. At the Rule 16 telephonic scheduling conference dates will be fixed for the following, as appropriate to the case: a) Joinder of additional parties and amendments to pleadings. b) Disclosure of deadlines for experts. c) Discovery scope, limits and completion. d) Filing of dispositive motions. e) Exchange of exhibits and final witness lists. f) Conferences before trial, including a final pretrial conference. g) Trial. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (KPH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan W. Hooss on behalf of David Bonds (Hooss, Ryan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, McCracken Circuit Court (MNM)
August 16, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint previously filed in state court action by Darling Ingredients, Inc. (MNM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Darling Ingredients, Inc. (MNM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Darling Ingredients, Inc. from McCracken Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-708 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2925129). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Counsel, #3 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonds v. Darling Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bonds
Represented By: Ryan W. Hooss
Represented By: Brian R. Dettman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darling Ingredients, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiorella
Represented By: Daniel E. Murner
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Winchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?