My Retirement Account Services, LLC et al v. Alternative IRA Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: My Retirement Account Services, LLC and The Kingdom Trust Company
Defendant: Digitalira.com, LLC, Bitgo, Inc., Camilo Concha, Bitgo Trust Company, Inc., Alternative IRA Services, LLC and Chris Kline
Case Number: 5:2019cv00122
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 29 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Bitgo Trust Company, Inc. COMPLETED on 10/18/2019. Secretary of State return states 8/29/2019. (MNM)
October 18, 2019 Filing 28 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Camilo Concha COMPLETED on 10/18/2019. Secretary of State return states 8/29/2019. (MNM)
October 18, 2019 Filing 27 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Chris Kline COMPLETED on 10/18/2019. Secretary of State return states 8/29/2019. (MNM)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AND JUDGMENT signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/17/2019. Granting #6 Motion to Dismiss; Denying #5 Motion to Dismiss; Motion for More Definite Statement ; Motion to Transfer Case. cc: Counsel(KJA)
October 18, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/17/2019; re MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Transfer Case, #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #5 MOTION to Dismiss . A separate order shall enter.cc:counsel (KJA)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/4/2019. The Telephonic Conference set for October 7, 2019 is CANCELLED. The Court is reviewing the pleadings and will notify counsel if a hearing is necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (KPH)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/3/2019. At the request of counsel, a Telephonic Conference is set for 10/7/2019 at 12:45 PM Central Time before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. The Court will place the call to counsel. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (KPH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Expedite Briefing filed by Alternative IRA Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SoS Screencap, #2 Exhibit Initial Filings 2011, #3 Exhibit 2016 Annual Report, #4 Exhibit 2017 Annual Report, #5 Exhibit 2018 Annual Report, #6 Exhibit Collective Action Complaint and Exhibits, #7 Exhibit Declaration of T Fowler ISO Motion To Dismiss) (Fowler, Kevin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION to Transfer Case, #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by My Retirement Account Services, LLC, The Kingdom Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alternative IRA SOS, #2 Exhibit DigitalIRA SOS, #3 Exhibit Charles Ives Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D.C. Micro v. Lange, #5 Exhibit Jason Anderson Affidavit, #6 Proposed Order) (Morgan, Jessica)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for Proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell: Telephone Conference held on 9/19/2019. Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. MOTION to Transfer Case, #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , #6 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement, #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Expedite Briefing. Responses due by 9/30/2019. Replies due by 10/4/2019. cc:counsel (KJA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Bitgo, Inc. COMPLETED on 9/20/2019. Secretary of State return states 9/4/2019. (KJA)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/20/2019. Granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Seth E. Darmstadter. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(KJA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Seth E. Darmstadter to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2947385. by Defendants Alternative IRA Services, LLC, Camilo Concha, Digitalira.com, LLC, Chris Kline (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Seth Darmstadter, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Seth Darmstadter, #3 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion of Seth Darmstadter) (Fowler, Kevin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice of Court Documents by Alternative IRA Services, LLC, Camilo Concha, Digitalira.com, LLC, Chris Kline (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ECF No. 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - ECF No. 3 -Motion for TRO, #3 Exhibit C - ECF No. 4 - Memo ISO TRO, #4 Exhibit D - ECF No. 6 - Decl. of Kline ISO TRO, #5 Exhibit E - ECF No. 7 - Decl. of Ishihara ISO TRO, #6 Exhibit F - ECF No. 8 - Decl. of Trimboli ISO TRO, #7 Exhibit G - ECF No. 44 - Order Staying Proceedings ISO TRO) (Fowler, Kevin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Expedite Briefing by Defendants Alternative IRA Services, LLC, Camilo Concha, Digitalira.com, LLC, Chris Kline (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Fowler, Kevin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Alternative IRA Services, LLC COMPLETED on 9/18/2019. Secretary of State return states 8/29/2019. (MNM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Digitalira.com, LLC COMPLETED on 9/18/2019. Secretary of State return states 8/29/2019. (MNM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MY RETIREMENT ACCOUNT SERVICES LLC for The Kingdom Trust Company. by The Kingdom Trust Company. (Morgan, Jessica)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by My Retirement Account Services, LLC. (Morgan, Jessica)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent BitGo Holdings, Inc. for Bitgo, Inc.. by Bitgo, Inc.. (VanVactor, Zachary)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent BitGo Holdings, Inc. for Bitgo Trust Company, Inc.. by Bitgo Trust Company, Inc.. (VanVactor, Zachary)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by My Retirement Account Services, LLC, The Kingdom Trust Company. (Morgan, Jessica)
September 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Bitgo Trust Company, Inc., Bitgo, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (VanVactor, Zachary)
September 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION to Dismiss ; Error: not all filers were selected; multiple motion relief document filed as one relief; Correction: advised filer of all errors and not to refile; corrections made by the Court. (KJA)
September 9, 2019 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants Camilo Concha, Digitalira.com, LLC, Chris Kline (SEE DN #6 FOR FULL VIEWING) (KJA)
September 9, 2019 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendants Alternative IRA Services, LLC, Camilo Concha, Digitalira.com, LLC, Chris Kline(SEE DN #5 FOR FULL VIEWING) (KJA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Alternative IRA Services, LLC, Digitalira.com, LLC, Camilo Concha, Chris Kline (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Filing Info, #3 Exhibit Info KY SOS, #4 Exhibit KTC - KY, #5 Exhibit Camillo Declaration, #6 Exhibit Kline Declaration, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Nathaniel Fowler, #8 Proposed Order) (Fowler, Kevin) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add filers(KJA).
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Alternative IRA Services, LLC, Digitalira.com, Camilo Concha and Chris Kline (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Fowler, Kevin) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add filers (KJA).
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing or Determination re:Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint (KJA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (attested copy of complaint emailed to counsel for plaintiff) (KJA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (KJA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by My Retirement Account Services, LLC, The Kingdom Trust Company against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-292935. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: My Retirement Account Services, LLC et al v. Alternative IRA Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digitalira.com, LLC
Represented By: Kevin N. Fowler
Represented By: Seth E. Darmstadter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitgo, Inc.
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camilo Concha
Represented By: Kevin N. Fowler
Represented By: Seth E. Darmstadter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitgo Trust Company, Inc.
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative IRA Services, LLC
Represented By: Kevin N. Fowler
Represented By: Seth E. Darmstadter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Kline
Represented By: Kevin N. Fowler
Represented By: Seth E. Darmstadter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Retirement Account Services, LLC
Represented By: Jessica S. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kingdom Trust Company
Represented By: Jessica S. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?