Boyd et al v. State of Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Torell DeWayne Boyd and Daniel Shawn Allison
Defendant: Christian County, Kentucky, State of Kentucky and City of Hopkinsville, Kentucky
Case Number: 5:2019cv00136
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 11/7/2019. Plaintiff Allison shall either pay his $175.00 portion of the filing fee or file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees along with a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six months immediately preceding the filing of this action within 30 days from entry of this Order.cc: plaintiff pro se (IFP application sent) (KJA)
October 10, 2019 Response to #6 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Torell DeWayne Boyd. (See DN #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, and tendered Summons forms attached to DN #1 .) (CDF) Modified to remark that deficiency is still pending as to Daniel Shawn Allison on 10/10/2019 (CDF).
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Torell DeWayne Boyd (Attachments: #1 letter & attachment) (CDF)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Torell DeWayne Boyd (CDF)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint, #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Reason for Deficiency: Summons for Each Defendant and Fully Completed Application to Proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/23/2019. (MNM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Daniel Shawn Allison. Individual motion not yet filed. (MNM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Torell DeWayne Boyd. (MNM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Torell DeWayne Boyd (MNM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christian County, Kentucky, City of Hopkinsville, Kentucky, and State of Kentucky, filed by Torell DeWayne Boyd and Daniel Shawn Allison. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Continued, #2 Exhibits) (MNM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #3 tendered Summons forms) (CDF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd et al v. State of Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian County, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hopkinsville, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torell DeWayne Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Shawn Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?