Beard v. Mortgage Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christi Beard
Defendant: Mortgage Management, Inc. and Yashu Anand
Case Number: 5:2019cv00185
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yashu Anand, Mortgage Management, Inc.. (Skidmore, Kif)
January 17, 2020 REPORT OF PARTIES' Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Yashu Anand, Mortgage Management, Inc. PREVIOUSLY FILED AT #11 UNDER DIFFERENT EVENT SELECTION. (MNM)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/10/2020. IT IS ORDERED:1. Counsel who will represent the parties at trial and who have full authority to enter stipulations, to make admissions, and to bind the parties with respect to dates agreed upon or ordered shall be available for a TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON JANUARY 17, 2020 at 11:15 AM CENTRAL TIME. The Court will place the call to counsel.2. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. counsel shall discuss and establish a discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court at the scheduling conference either orally during the telephonic conference or in writing. Counsel are directed to make the mandatory disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(l) Fed.R.Civ.P. by said conference date.3. At the Rule 16 telephonic scheduling conference dates will be fixed for the following, as appropriate to the case: a) Joinder of additional parties and amendments to pleadings. b) Disclosure of deadlines for experts. c) Discovery scope, limits and completion. d) Filing of dispositive motions. e) Exchange of exhibits and final witness lists. f) Conferences before trial, including a final pretrial conference. g) Trial.[Docket #5 Motion to Extend now moot] This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel(KPH)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Yashu Anand by Yashu Anand, Mortgage Management, Inc.. (Skidmore, Kif)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Mortgage Management, Inc. by Yashu Anand, Mortgage Management, Inc.. (Skidmore, Kif)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kif H. Skidmore on behalf of Yashu Anand, Mortgage Management, Inc. (Skidmore, Kif)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Management, Inc.. (Allen, James)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order For Extension of Time by Yashu Anand, Mortgage Management, Inc. by Yashu Anand, Mortgage Management, Inc.. (Allen, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Corey Asay on behalf of Christi Beard (Asay, Joseph)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Yashu Anand and Mortgage Management, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yashu Anand and Mortgage Management, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2994237, filed by Christi Beard. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beard v. Mortgage Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Beard
Represented By: Adrian Martin Mendiondo
Represented By: Joseph Corey Asay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Management, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Allen
Represented By: Kif H. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yashu Anand
Represented By: James D. Allen
Represented By: Kif H. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?