United States of America v. Bowles et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Heather D. Bowles, Farmers Bank & Trust Company, Heather Dawn Bowles, Commonwealth of Kentucky and Byron Keith Bowles
Case Number: 5:2019cv00189
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/25/2020. Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. cc: Counsel(KJA)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Commonwealth of Kentucky served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Farmers Bank & Trust Company served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Campbell, William)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Byron Keith Bowles served on 12/7/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Campbell, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Heather D. Bowles served on 12/7/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Campbell, William)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Byron Keith Bowles, Heather D. Bowles, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Farmers Bank & Trust Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (KJA)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (KJA)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against Byron Keith Bowles, Heather D. Bowles, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Farmers Bank & Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D-Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E-Recoupment Lien, #6 Cover Sheet) (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bowles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather D. Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Bank & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Dawn Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Keith Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?