United States of America v. Danner et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kelly M. Danner and Credit Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv00002
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time "to file the proper paperwork" by Defendant Kelly M. Danner. (SMJ)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Kelly M. Danner served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Stinnett, W.)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (Campbell, William)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Credit Acceptance Corporation served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Credit Acceptance Corporation and Kelly M. Danner. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit Acceptance Corporation and Kelly M. Danner, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Judgment Lien, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Danner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly M. Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: W. Scott Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?