United States of America v. Crouch et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of William R. Crouch, Unifund CCR Partners, Arrow Financial Services, LLC, Any Unknown Spouse of Mary Crouch and Mary Crouch
Case Number: 5:2020cv00029
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Any Unknown Spouse of Mary Crouch and Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of William R. Crouch by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William) Modified on 3/5/2020-Text modified to reflect entry (MLG).
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mary Crouch served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (Campbell, William)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Arrow Financial Services, LLC served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Campbell, William)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (Campbell, William)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Unifund CCR Partners served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Campbell, William)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Arrow Financial Services, LLC, Mary Crouch, Unifund CCR Partners. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Unifund CCR Partners, #2 Summons as to Unifund CCR Partners, #3 Summons as to Arrow Financial Services, LLC, #4 Summons as to Arrow Financial Services, LLC) (DJT)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DJT)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of William R. Crouch, Any Unknown Spouse of Mary Crouch, Arrow Financial Services, LLC, Mary Crouch, Unifund CCR Partners, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #5 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Descent, #6 Exhibit E-Judgment Lien, #7 Exhibit F-Judgment Lien) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Crouch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of William R. Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifund CCR Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Spouse of Mary Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?