Thistlewood v. U.S. Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Dorothy Thistlewood
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00037
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan T. Priestle on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A. (Priestle, Evan)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/21/2020. IT IS ORDERED:1. Counsel who will represent the parties at trial and who have full authority to enter stipulations, to make admissions, and to bind the parties with respect to dates agreed upon or ordered shall be available for a TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 30, 2020 at 9:30 AM CENTRAL TIME. The Court will place the call to counsel.2. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. counsel shall discuss and establish a discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court at the scheduling conference either orally during the telephonic conference or in writing. Counsel are directed to make the mandatory disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(l) Fed.R.Civ.P. by said conference date.3. At the Rule 16 telephonic scheduling conference dates will be fixed for the following, as appropriate to the case: a) Joinder of additional parties and amendments to pleadings. b) Disclosure of deadlines for experts. c) Discovery scope, limits and completion. d) Filing of dispositive motions. e) Exchange of exhibits and final witness lists. f) Conferences before trial, including a final pretrial conference. g) Trial. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (KPH)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, [Answer and Affirmative Defenses] by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Kremer, Connie)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/7/2020. Extending time for defendant to answer complaint up to 4/21/2020.cc:counsel (KJA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Parties for Extension of Answer Date by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Kremer, Connie)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Kremer, Connie)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy Thistlewood. U.S. Bank, National Association served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (Sullenger, D.)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank, National Association. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank, National Association. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3049287, filed by Dorothy Thistlewood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - Right to Sue Letter, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thistlewood v. U.S. Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Thistlewood
Represented By: D. Wes Sullenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Evan T. Priestle
Represented By: Connie M. Kremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?