Ricketts v. Inland Marine Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Ricketts
Defendant: Inland Marine Service, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00112
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/6/2020.IT IS ORDERED:1. Counsel shall be available for a TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2020 at 10:30 AM CENTRAL TIME. The Court will place the call to counsel.2. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. counsel shall discuss and establish a discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court at the scheduling conference either orally during the telephonic conference or in writing. Counsel are directed to make the mandatory disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(l) Fed.R.Civ.P. by said conference date.3. At the Rule 16 telephonic scheduling conference dates will be fixed for the following, as appropriate to the case: a) Joinder of additional parties and amendments to pleadings. b) Disclosure of deadlines for experts. c) Discovery scope, limits and completion. d) Filing of dispositive motions. e) Exchange of exhibits and final witness lists. f) Conferences before trial, including a final pretrial conference. g) Trial. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (KPH)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Inland Marine Service, Inc.. (Sullivan, Megan)
July 17, 2020 ***Answer Date Set to: 8/6/2020 for Inland Marine Service, Inc. (MNM)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Ricketts. Inland Marine Service, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Bloomfield, L.) Modified on 7/17/2020 to edit text (MNM).
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Inland Marine Service, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). Attested copy of Complaint emailed to counsel. (MNM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Inland Marine Service, Inc., filed by Jason Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricketts v. Inland Marine Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inland Marine Service, Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Powers
Represented By: Megan A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ricketts
Represented By: L. Jeff Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?