Teeters v. Justin Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Teeters
Defendant: Cat 5 Commerce, LLC doing business as Cat5 Commerce Drop Ship and Justin Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00123
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Justin Brands, Inc.. (Sigler, James)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kenneth Teeters. (Tveite, Charles)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cat 5 Commerce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order & Tracking information) (McCall, William)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/24/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 12/17/2021., Expert Discovery due by 11/15/2021., Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 10/8/2021., Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 7/15/2021., Fact Discovery due by 4/23/2021., Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2022 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 at 9:00 AM in Paducah Courtroom before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Telephone Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Telephone Conference set for 4/23/2021 at 9:30 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. cc:counsel, CM-King (KJA)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order Joint Litigation Plan by Justin Brands, Inc.. (Sigler, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cat 5 Commerce, LLC. (McCall, William)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/14/2020 granting #4 Motion to Withdraw. M. Taylor Rains is hereby relieved as counsel of record for and on behalf of defendant CAT5. The defendant will continue to be represented by W. Lucas McCall, who shall remain attorney of record. cc: Counsel(MNM)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/14/2020. IT IS ORDERED:1. Counsel shall be available for a TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON AUGUST 24, 2020 at 10:00 AM CENTRAL TIME. The Court will place the call to counsel.2. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. counsel shall discuss and establish a discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court at the scheduling conference either orally during the telephonic conference or in writing. Counsel are directed to make the mandatory disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(l) Fed.R.Civ.P. by said conference date.3. At the Rule 16 telephonic scheduling conference dates will be fixed for the following, as appropriate to the case: a) Joinder of additional parties and amendments to pleadings. b) Disclosure of deadlines for experts. c) Discovery scope, limits and completion. d) Filing of dispositive motions. e) Exchange of exhibits and final witness lists. f) Conferences before trial, including a final pretrial conference. g) Trial. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (KPH)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Justin Brands, Inc.. (Sigler, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Justin Brands, Inc.. (Sigler, James)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cat 5 Commerce, LLC. (McCall, William)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney M. Taylor Rains by Defendant Cat 5 Commerce, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order withdraw of attorney M. Taylor Rains) (McCall, William)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Ballard Circuit Court (MNM)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cat 5 Commerce, LLC from Ballard Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00040 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3145876). (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 Affidavit of Authority, #3 Notice Filed with State Court, #4 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teeters v. Justin Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Teeters
Represented By: Mark Edwards
Represented By: Charles A. Tveite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cat 5 Commerce, LLC doing business as Cat5 Commerce Drop Ship
Represented By: William L. McCall
Represented By: M. Taylor Rains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Brands, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Sigler
Represented By: James Patrick Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?