Turner v. Commonwealth of Kentucky
Petitioner: Jeramiah Edward Turner
Respondent: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Case Number: 5:2020cv00136
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L. McKeehan on behalf of Commonwealth of Kentucky (McKeehan, Stephanie)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Respondent Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing) (Shackelford, James)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Shackelford on behalf of Commonwealth of Kentucky (Shackelford, James)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Attorney General. (MNM)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/15/2020 Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. The Clerk of Court shall forward by certified mail, return receipt requested, one copy of the petition (DN 1) and this Order on the Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Kentucky. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Petitioner a copy of the Pro SePrisoner Handbook. cc: Petitioner, pro se, Attorney General, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Office of Criminal Appeals, 1024 Capital Center Drive,Frankfort, KY 40601, CM-King (KJA)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to re #4 Order filed by Jeramiah Edward Turner.(signature page attached to DN 1) (KJA)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/27/2020. IT IS ORDERED that McGuire does not qualify for next-friend status and that this Court is without jurisdiction over this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within 30 days of the entry date of this Order, Petitioner Turner must sign the petition on his own behalf. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a copy of the petition (DN 1) for his signature should he wish to pursue this action. Petitioner's failure to comply with this Order within the time allotted will result in dismissal of this action for lack of jurisdiction. cc: Petitioner, pro se; Tabitha McGuire (MNM)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Public Defender by Petitioner Jeramiah Edward Turner (KJA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jeramiah Edward Turner. $5.00 filing fee paid, receipt number P33004070. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Power of Attorney) (MNM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2020: #3 signature page) (KJA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeramiah Edward Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Stephanie L. McKeehan
Represented By: James C. Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?