Ferry et al v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Ferry and Annette R. Ferry
Defendant: Johnny Albert Davis, Todd Dean Trowbridge, Mark Allen Bryan, John L. Warner, III and David Newton Johnson
Case Number: 5:2021cv00019
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by John L. Warner, III. (Jones, Brian)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annette R. Ferry, Timothy J. Ferry Proof of Service-David Newton Johnson (Thomas, Daniel)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annette R. Ferry, Timothy J. Ferry Proof of Service-Todd Dean Trowbridge (Thomas, Daniel)
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annette R. Ferry, Timothy J. Ferry Proof of Service-Mark Allen Bryan (Thomas, Daniel)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mark Allen Bryan, Johnny Albert Davis, David Newton Johnson, and Todd Dean Trowbridge. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Annette R. Ferry, Timothy J. Ferry (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Thomas, Daniel)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timothy J. Ferry, Annette R. Ferry. John L. Warner, III waiver sent on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Thomas, Daniel)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (MNM)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Allen Bryan, Johnny Albert Davis, David Newton Johnson, Todd Dean Trowbridge, and John L. Warner, III. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3282501, filed by Timothy J. Ferry, Annette R. Ferry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Title Opinion, #3 Exhibit C - Warranty Deed, #4 Exhibit D - Settlement Statement, #5 Exhibit E - Official Check, #6 Exhibit F - Access Easement, #7 Exhibit G - Correspondence, #8 Exhibit H - Warranty Deed, #9 Exhibit I - Correspondence, #10 Exhibit J - Notice of Lis Pendens) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferry et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Ferry
Represented By: Daniel N. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette R. Ferry
Represented By: Daniel N. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Albert Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Dean Trowbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Allen Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Warner, III
Represented By: Brian Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Newton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?