Hines v. Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC
Plaintiff: Amanda Hines and Amanda Stringer
Defendant: Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC formerly known as Heath Bryan Coleman DDS of Kentucky doing business as DDS Dentures + Implant Solutions of Paducah KY and Heath Bryan Coleman DDS of Kentucky
Case Number: 5:2021cv00027
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/1/2021. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 4/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2021. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 10/30/2021. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 11/30/2021. Fact Discovery due by 9/15/2022. Discovery due by 11/15/2022. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l)(A) this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lanny King for ruling on all discovery motions. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/15/2022 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. Daubert Motion due by 12/15/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2022. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2023 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. Jury Trial set for 4/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in Paducah Courtroom before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. cc: Counsel, CM-King (MNM)
April 1, 2021 Response to #13 Notice of Deficiency. (MNM)
April 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC re #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) (Muller, Aimee)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency re #12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Reason for Deficiency: Proposed Order. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/8/2021. (MNM)
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC (Muller, Aimee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (MNM).
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC. (Muller, Aimee)
April 1, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC. (Muller, Aimee)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Amanda Hines. (Sullenger, D.)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/23/2021. IT IS ORDERED:1. Counsel shall be available for a TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 1, 2021 at 10:00 AM CENTRAL TIME. The Court will place the call to counsel.2. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. counsel shall discuss and establish a discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court at the scheduling conference either orally during the telephonic conference or in writing. Counsel are directed to make the mandatory disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(l) Fed.R.Civ.P. by said conference date.3. At the Rule 16 telephonic scheduling conference dates will be fixed for the following, as appropriate to the case: a) Joinder of additional parties and amendments to pleadings. b) Disclosure of deadlines for experts. c) Discovery scope, limits and completion. d) Filing of dispositive motions. e) Exchange of exhibits and final witness lists. f) Conferences before trial, including a final pretrial conference. g) Trial. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (KPH)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Status Change Form) (Muller, Aimee)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/18/2021. Granting #5 Proposed Agreed Order extending time to answer up to 3/23/2021. cc: Counsel(KJA)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order by Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC. (Muller, Aimee)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Hines. Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Sullenger, D.)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC, filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3285745, filed by Amanda Hines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - Right-to-Sue Letter, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hines
Represented By: D. Wes Sullenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Stringer
Represented By: D. Wes Sullenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Dentures & Implants - Kentucky, PLLC formerly known as Heath Bryan Coleman DDS of Kentucky doing business as DDS Dentures + Implant Solutions of Paducah KY
Represented By: Aimee E. Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Bryan Coleman DDS of Kentucky
Represented By: Aimee E. Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?