Hall v. C.J. Mahan Construction Company et al
Plaintiff: Curt L. Hall
Defendant: C.J. Mahan Construction Company, Pine Bluff Materials Co. LLC, United States of America and Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00028
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Lawrence, Malinda)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Curt L. Hall. C.J. Mahan Construction Company waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Katz, Brian)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Curt L. Hall. Pine Bluff Materials Co. LLC waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Katz, Brian)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Curt L. Hall. Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Katz, Brian)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curt L. Hall as to:United States of America (Katz, Brian)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curt L. Hall as to United States of America served on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Katz, Brian)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to C.J. Mahan Construction Company, LLC; Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company; Pine Bluff Materials Co. LLC on 2/17/2021 by Curt L. Hall. Waiver of Service due by 3/19/2021. (MNM)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.J. Mahan Construction Company, Pine Bluff Materials Co. LLC, Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company, and United States of America, filed by Curt L. Hall. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. C.J. Mahan Construction Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.J. Mahan Construction Company
Represented By: Megan A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Bluff Materials Co. LLC
Represented By: C. Thomas Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Malinda R. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company
Represented By: C. Thomas Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curt L. Hall
Represented By: Brian S. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?