Sadler v. Wellpath et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Sadler
Defendant: Pratul Patel, Angela Clifford, Ashley Vanmeter, Patricia Carey, Anna D'Amico, Cookie Crews, Mary Murphy, Jann Edington, Brad Adams, C/O Coconougher, Denise Burkett, C/O Garret, Scott Jordan, James Hawkins, Margaret Franchere, Mark Meyermann, Karen Ramey, Kristen Ponzetti, U/A Hawkins, Jeff Traczewski, Stephanie Thompson, Randy White, Dawn Patterson, Austin Bowman, Alisha Wells, Wellpath, Shelli Votaw, Angela Oakes and Jaiesha Parks
Case Number: 5:2021cv00063
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Anthony Sadler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (KJA)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/28/2021. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send the Court's Order DN #8 and the response DN #9 to Plaintiff at his new address of record. Plaintiff may file a reply to Defendants' response to his motion for preliminary injunction/TRO within 14 days. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Counsel of Record (MNM)
June 15, 2021 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number L33067181 by Anthony Sadler. (Ferguson, Kim)
June 14, 2021 Filing 13 Letter to Senior Judge Russell from Tony Sadler. (scanned for docketing 6/28/2021) (MNM)
June 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony Sadler (KJA)
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Diana D'Amico, DNs 1, 4, 8. (MNM)
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Lilly on behalf of Scott Jordan (Lilly, Richard)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Anna D'Amico, Scott Jordan, Kristen Ponzetti, Wellpath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1: KDOC Bed Assignment, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2: Dr. D'Amico Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exh. 3: Surgical Note, #4 Proposed Order) (Sharp, William)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/29/2021 denying #4 Motion for TRO. However, the Court will require Defendants to respond to the motion for preliminary injunction. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Defendant Wellpath at its registered agent, Corporate Creations Network, Inc., 101 North Seventh Street, Louisville, KY 40202; Diana DAmico; Scott Jordan; and Kristen Ponzetti a copy of the complaint DN #1 , the motion for preliminary injunction DN #4 , and this Order. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Wellpath; Diana DAmico; Scott Jordan; and Kristen Ponzetti shall file a response to the motion for a preliminary injunction DN #4 within 14 days from entry of this Order. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants Wellpath, DAmico, Jordan, and Ponzetti (as directed); General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel(MNM)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/28/2021 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Once the review is complete, an Order will be entered informing the parties of what steps, if any, must be taken. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Financial Section, USDC, WDKY; KSP, Inmate Accounts(MNM)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Anthony Sadler. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration) (MNM)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Anthony Sadler. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (MNM)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony Sadler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) by Anthony Sadler. (MNM)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Sadler. (MNM)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Sadler. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadler v. Wellpath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratul Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Vanmeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna D'Amico
Represented By: Charles M. Rutledge
Represented By: William E. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cookie Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jann Edington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Coconougher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Burkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Garret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jordan
Represented By: Richard D. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Franchere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Meyermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Ponzetti
Represented By: Charles M. Rutledge
Represented By: William E. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U/A Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Traczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Represented By: Charles M. Rutledge
Represented By: William E. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelli Votaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaiesha Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?