Brown v. Witty
Plaintiff: Brian C. Brown
Defendant: Patty Witty
Case Number: 5:2021cv00121
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell: Scheduling Conference held on 10/14/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2021., Daubert Motion due by 12/16/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2022., Expert Discovery due by 12/1/2022., Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 10/14/2022., Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 9/14/2022., Fact Discovery due by 7/15/2022., Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Jury Trial set for 3/27/2023 at 9:00 AM in Paducah Courtroom before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Telephone Conference set for 7/15/2022 at 10:30 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Telephone Conference set for 12/16/2022 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. cc:counsel, CM-King (KJA)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brian C. Brown. (Polczynski, Ryan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Patty Witty (Riley, David)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Brian C. Brown (Polczynski, Ryan)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/17/2021. Granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney Ryan Polczynski. Attorney Lee T. White terminated. cc: Counsel(KJA)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiff Brian C. Brown (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Polczynski, Ryan)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/15/2021. IT IS ORDERED:1. Counsel shall be available for a TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 14, 2021 at 9:00 AM CENTRAL TIME. The Court will place the call to counsel.2. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. counsel shall discuss and establish a discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court at the scheduling conference either orally during the telephonic conference or in writing. Counsel are directed to make the mandatory disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(l) Fed.R.Civ.P. by said conference date.3. At the Rule 16 telephonic scheduling conference dates will be fixed for the following, as appropriate to the case: a) Joinder of additional parties and amendments to pleadings. b) Disclosure of deadlines for experts. c) Discovery scope, limits and completion. d) Filing of dispositive motions. e) Exchange of exhibits and final witness lists. f) Conferences before trial, including a final pretrial conference. g) Trial. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (KPH)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Patty Witty. (Riley, David)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Christian Circuit Court (MNM)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Patty Witty from Christian Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00644 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3412979). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Witty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian C. Brown
Represented By: Lee T. White
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Witty
Represented By: David T. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?