United States of America v. An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 1.16 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Calloway County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 1.16 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Calloway County, Kentucky, Elizabeth L. Farmer, James G. Farmer, Patrick Ritchey and Daniel Ritchey
Case Number: 5:2021cv00177
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 0831
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM re #9 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by United States of America. (Chase, James)
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Possession) (Chase, James)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Tendering Deposit by United States of America (Chase, James)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS: The Court grants the United States' motion to deposit funds (DN #6 ) and orders the Clerk of Court to accept a check for $3,550 to be deposited in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 67(b) and the Declaration of Taking filed in this case. cc: Counsel, Finance, JV, DD (JM)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support) (Chase, James)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 Declaration of Taking by United States of America re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Property Description, #2 Exhibit B - Map) (MNM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Property Description) (MNM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 1.16 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Calloway County, Kentucky, Elizabeth L. Farmer, James G. Farmer, Daniel Ritchey, and Patrick Ritchey, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Property Description, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 1.16 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Calloway County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 1.16 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Calloway County, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth L. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Ritchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ritchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?