United States of America v. Bivens
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Betty Mae Bivens
Case Number: 5:2022cv00032
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 U.S. Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT BETTY MAE BIVENS (EBOC): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, upon request of the Plaintiff, that default is entered against the defendant Betty Mae Bivens, as provided in Rule 55(a), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. cc: Defendant Betty Mae Bivens (DLW)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default as to BETTY MAE BIVENS by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William)
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Betty Mae Bivens served on 3/15/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. (Campbell, William)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Betty Mae Bivens. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Betty Mae Bivens, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bivens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Mae Bivens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?