Mart v. Parrott et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Mart, Jr.
Defendant: Adam Parrott, Lauren Massey, Scott Jordan and Jackie Holmes
Case Number: 5:2023cv00017
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Bobby Mart, Jr. (JM)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Court grants plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees (DN #8 ). cc: Plaintiff (pro se), Finance, KSP- Inmate Accounts (JM)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Remark re #10 letter: A docket sheet has been sent to plaintiff on this date. (JM)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter from Plaintiff Bobby Mart, Jr. (JM)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from Plaintiff Bobby Mart, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JM)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bobby Mart, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JM)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jackie Holmes, Scott Jordan, Lauren Massey, Adam Parrott, filed by Bobby Mart, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope) (JM)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Response to #6 Notice of Deficiency filed by Bobby Mart, Jr. (Plaintiff has filed complaint/Summons and motion for IFP on court approved forms. See DN #7 and #8 ) (JM)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Complaint and IFP submitted on incorrect forms. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/15/2023. (CDL)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint - Missing summonses. (CDL)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (CDL)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bobby Mart, Jr. (CDL)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bobby Mart, Jr. (CDL)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jackie Holmes, Scott Jordan, Lauren Massey, Adam Parrott, (No filing fee paid), filed by Bobby Mart, Jr. (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mart v. Parrott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Mart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?