Witten v. Schafer et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Witten
Defendant: Stephen Schafer and Lauren Massey
Case Number: 5:2023cv00034
Filed: March 15, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to GO 23-06, this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, plaintiff pro se, CM-McKinley (KJA)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Joshua Witten (DJT)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF TENDERING SUMMONS by Joshua Witten re #5 Notice on Summons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JM)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint-incomplete summons. (CDL)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (CDL)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joshua Witten. (CDL)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joshua Witten. (CDL)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lauren Massey, Stephen Schafer, (No filing fee paid), filed by Joshua Witten. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Summons Tendered, #3 Envelope) (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witten v. Schafer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Witten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?