Killian et al v. Midea Group Co., LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Killian and Gary Killian
Defendant: Midea Group Co., LTD., GD Midea Air Conditioning Equipment Co., LTD, Midea America Corp., True Value Company, LLC, True Value Company, Acon Investments, LLC, Mayfield True Value and Shelbyville Lumber Company, Inc. doing business as Mayfield True Value
Case Number: 5:2023cv00141
Filed: October 23, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY re #9 MOTION to Remand , #16 Response to Motion filed by Gary Killian, Leslie Killian. (Morris, Douglas)
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Shelbyville Lumber Company, Inc. for Shelbyville Lumber Company, Inc.. by Shelbyville Lumber Company, Inc.. (Saxton, Jonathan)
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Acon Investments, LLC. (Yocum, Thomas)
December 5, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Hold ruling in Abeyance by Plaintiffs Gary Killian, Leslie Killian (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morris, Douglas)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 Diversity Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Shelbyville Lumber Company, Inc.. (Saxton, Jonathan) Modified docket text on 12/6/2023 to state that this is a diversity disclosure statement, not a corporate disclosure statement as filed. (JM).
December 4, 2023 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Acon Investments, LLC. (*NO PDF ATTACHED. This motion is an alternative relief found to be incorporated within Defendant's Reply filed at DN #13 . This entry has been made for reporting purposes. Please see DN #13 for viewing.) (JM)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Acon Investments, LLC. (Yocum, Thomas) Modified link on 12/5/2023 (JM).
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 Receipt of Non-Electronic Document re #10 Notice filed by Gary Killian, Leslie Killian (JM)
November 21, 2023 Filing 11 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Gary Killian, Leslie Killian. (Morris, Douglas)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing by Gary Killian, Leslie Killian (Morris, Douglas)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Gary Killian, Leslie Killian (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Morris, Douglas)
November 20, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gary Killian, Leslie Killian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Killian Declaration, #2 Exhibit Counsel Declaration, #3 Exhibit Portfolio - ACON, #4 Exhibit Web Article, #5 Exhibit Web Article 2, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Morris, Douglas)
October 30, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Acon Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yocum, Thomas)
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Acon Investments, LLC. (Yocum, Thomas)
October 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Missing Rule 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/31/2023. (KDY)
October 24, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Graves Circuit Court and counsel of record/parties re #1 Notice of Removal. (KDY)
October 24, 2023 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (KDY)
October 23, 2023 Filing 2 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Acon Investments, LLC. (KDY)
October 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Acon Investments, LLC from Graves Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00272. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AKYWDC-3906749). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Cover Sheet). (KDY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killian et al v. Midea Group Co., LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Killian
Represented By: Lea A. Player
Represented By: Douglas H. Morris
Represented By: Robyn Bell Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Killian
Represented By: Douglas H. Morris
Represented By: Robyn Bell Stanton
Represented By: Lea A. Player
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midea Group Co., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GD Midea Air Conditioning Equipment Co., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midea America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Value Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Value Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acon Investments, LLC
Represented By: Thomas R. Yocum
Represented By: Julie A. Neuroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayfield True Value
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelbyville Lumber Company, Inc. doing business as Mayfield True Value
Represented By: Jonathan P. Saxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?