Grubb v. Crews et al
Plaintiff: Joshua A. Grubb
Defendant: Cookie Crews, Scott Jordan, Laura Plappert, Lauren Massey and Amy L. Fisher
Case Number: 5:2024cv00069
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 5/29/24: IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. There being no just reason for delay in its entry, this is a final Order. This Court further certifies that an appeal in forma pauperis would be frivolous and therefore would not be taken in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). cc: Plaintiff(pro se) (DJT)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 5/29/24: The Court will enter a separate Order dismissing this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. cc: Plaintiff(pro se) (DJT)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Joshua A. Grubb. (DJT)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Schedules Initial Review due by 8/26/2024. (EAS)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 4/23/24; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: cc: Plaintiff(pro se), Finance, KSP(DJT)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joshua A. Grubb by Joshua A. Grubb. (EAS)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joshua A. Grubb (EAS)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EAS)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cookie Crews, Amy L. Fisher, Scott Jordan, Lauren Massey, Laura Plappert, filed by Joshua A. Grubb. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (EAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grubb v. Crews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua A. Grubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cookie Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Plappert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy L. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?