Thompson v. Geddie
Plaintiff: Nikole Thompson
Defendant: Karen Geddie
Case Number: 5:2024cv00097
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 mv Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 7/10/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577. cc: counsel (JM)
July 10, 2024 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
May 31, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen H. Thomas on behalf of Nikole Thompson (Thomas, Stephen)
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Allison Orberson-Wiles re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/6/2024. (KJA)
May 16, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Marshall Circuit Court and counsel of record/parties re #1 Notice of Removal. (KDY)
May 16, 2024 Filing 3 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Karen Geddie. (KDY)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (KDY)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Karen Geddie from Marshall Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-00149. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4034314) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Marshall Circuit Court 24-CI-149 Pleadings, #2 Cover Sheet) (KDY)
May 16, 2024 ANSWER (Filed in Marshall Circuit Court - See DN #1 -1) by Karen Geddie. (KDY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Geddie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikole Thompson
Represented By: Stephen H. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Geddie
Represented By: William B. Orberson, Jr.
Represented By: Allison Orberson-Wiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?