FTC v. NBC, et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: National Business Consultants, Inc., Robert Namer, Namer Inc, America First Communications, Inc., Voice of America Inc and Friends of Robert Namer
Movant: Robin Acrey, Hugh Garner, Rachel Hendricks, Pamela Ledet, Dale Logan, Laura Morgan, David Starr, Edwin Webster, Kenneth Kirchem, First National Bank of Houma, Brook, Morial, Cassibry, Fraiche & Pizza, United States of America, Secor Bank, Principal Mutual Life Insurance Company, Ford Motor Credit Company, MCDJ, LLC and Hardy, Carey, Chautin & Balkin, LLP
Garnishee: Deposit Guaranty National Bank, First National Bank of Commerce, America First Communications, Inc., Omni Bank, Whitney National Bank, Hibernia National Bank, WTIX Radio, George H Buck, WASO Radio, America First Communications, Inc., Copytek-Tronics Inc, Safari Auto Trading, Inc., P&A Holdings, Inc., Blue Haven National Management, Inc. and Blue Haven Pools of Louisiana, Inc.
Trustee: Robert L Marrero
Claimant: Robert Namer
Receiver: Claude C Lightfoot, Jr
Case Number: 2:1989cv01740
Filed: October 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1614 ORDER denying 1601 Motion to Strike Affidavit. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/14/2014. (blg)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1595 ORDER granting 1593 Motion to Expedite; denying 1589 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 1590 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/27/2014. (blg)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1584 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 1568 . ORDERED that Namer's 1558 motion to quash and for an accounting is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Namer's 1565 motion for reconsideration is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the writs of ga rnishment that erroneously describe an initial November 8, 1991 judgment of $9,145,009.40 are AMENDED to reflect the correct November 8, 1991 judgment of $3,019,377.00. FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall submit an affidavit on or before 2/3/2014, setting forth the calculations, including, for example, any credits for payments made by Namer, used to compute the total balance of $12,199,760.57, which was submitted by the government on 12/12/2013. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/22/2014.(blg)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1577 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 1562 , that the Federal Trade Commissions objection to the answer of garnishee, Wingert, Grebing, Brubaker & Justice, LLP is SUSTAINED; FURTHER ORDERED that Wingert shall supplement its answer to the FTCs writ of garnishment on or before 1/13/2014 as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk.(lag, )
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1568 ORDERED that Namer's 1558 Motion to Quash and for an Accounting is DENIED; and his 1565 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (gec, )
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1430 ORDER AND REASONS denying 1418 Motion for Reconsideration of Orders 1412 , 1413 , 1417 ; Further Ordered that the 1374 Motion for Hearing on Exemptions is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (ecm, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 ORDER denying 1414 Motion for Reconsideration of 1412 Order as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 11/5/09. (ecm, )
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 ORDER AND REASONS denying 1355 Motion to Quash Seizure as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (ecm, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 1397 ; Ordered that the 1392 Final MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs is Granted; and Emile L Turner, Jr. and the Law Office of Emile L. Turner, Jr. are awarded fees as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon.(ijg, )(NEF: Judge Shushan)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1392 Final MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs (Set Before Magistrate Per Order No. 1263) filed by Emile L Turner, Jr. Objections to R&R due by 9/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan.(ecm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FTC v. NBC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Janice Charter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Business Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Cary Joseph Deaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Namer
Represented By: Peyton B. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namer Inc
Represented By: Robert G. Harvey, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America First Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. Harvey, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voice of America Inc
Represented By: Robert G. Harvey, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends of Robert Namer
Represented By: Robert G. Harvey, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Robin Acrey
Represented By: Kenneth William Kirchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Hugh Garner
Represented By: Kenneth William Kirchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Rachel Hendricks
Represented By: Kenneth William Kirchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Pamela Ledet
Represented By: Kenneth William Kirchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Dale Logan
Represented By: Kenneth William Kirchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Laura Morgan
Represented By: Kenneth William Kirchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: David Starr
Represented By: Kenneth William Kirchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Edwin Webster
Represented By: Kenneth William Kirchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Kenneth Kirchem
Represented By: Kenneth William Kirchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: First National Bank of Houma
Represented By: Alvin Andrew LeBlanc, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Brook, Morial, Cassibry, Fraiche & Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Sharon Denise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Secor Bank
Represented By: Robert Legier Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Principal Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry H. Grodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Ford Motor Credit Company
Represented By: Arthur Seldon Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: MCDJ, LLC
Represented By: W. Christopher Beary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Hardy, Carey, Chautin & Balkin, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Deposit Guaranty National Bank
Represented By: A. Michael Dufilho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: First National Bank of Commerce
Represented By: William Kearney Christovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: America First Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. Harvey, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Omni Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Whitney National Bank
Represented By: John Anthony Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Hibernia National Bank
Represented By: Paula D. Eady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: WTIX Radio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: George H Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: WASO Radio, America First Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Copytek-Tronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Safari Auto Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: P&A Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Blue Haven National Management, Inc.
Represented By: Leo J. D'Aubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Blue Haven Pools of Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: Leo J. D'Aubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Robert L Marrero
Represented By: Dennis Michael Dendy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Namer
Represented By: Peyton B. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Claude C Lightfoot, Jr
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?