In Re: DRD Towing Company, Inc.
Defendant: Muracin Vilceus, Dominic H. Green and Alexander Scott
Petitioner: Laurin Maritime AB, Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, DRD Towing Company, Inc., Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited and Laurin Maritime (America) Inc.
Claimant: Steve Adams, Randy White, Sr., Dedrick T. Lebeau, Fabian F. Zeringue, Sterling C. Anderson, Robert Jackson, Dorian Sippio, Erica L. Boudreaux, Frankcard Goodjoint, Sr., Linda C. Davis, Guatam Rumar Sau, Crayton A. Martin, Enos Jones, Dwayne V. Burrell, Kenneth Black, Stephen Marshall Gabarick, Marco Hunt, Regional Broussard, Wendell Bailey, Rahjonae M. Briggs, Robert E. Nelson, Elizabeth M. Dumas, Wayne A. Louviere, Hillary J. Prader, Lloyd J. Buchanan, Russell L. Bradley, James Lang, Henry Bass, Jr., Deanca W. Ward, Glenn Stevenson, American Commercial Lines LLC, Carmen Dor Lornisca, Anthony J. Faulkin, Wayne Overton, Horace R. Porter, Eddie Simons, Robert W. Williams, Keith N. Pickens, Ashis Halder, Eric R. Briggs, Ervin J. Broyard, Christopher A. Roberts, Johnathan P. Morrissey, Paul A. Bordes, Paul Dillon, Sr., Albert L. Smith, Craig Stieber, Billy D. Cotton, Dayshawn M. Matthews, Trudence Morgan, Terry A. Banks, Samuel J. Bijou, Pravakar Digar, James L. Guillot, Terrell L. Pye, Donnie D. Panerello, Melvin A. Robinson, Robert Richardson, John A. Jefferson, Warren Roberts, Darre C. Finney, Gary McKenzie, Eugene Watson, III, Peola O. Desdunes, Hugh J. Latulas, Edmond Jose Joseph, Joseph J. Berrio, Emmet Pembrook, Anthony Marrero, Dinnas Ratliff, Dieubon St. Juste, Deborah Bruce, Jeffery C. Champagne, Alfred Wilson, Jackson N. Shenica, Warren Dupar, Shawn M. Randolph, Thomas L. Atkinson, Nathan H. Scott, Realious Claiborne, Harry C. Sims, Sr., Gerald Foucha, Donald Roberts, Oles Chery, Eldridge E. Payton, Jean Pierre Louis, Frederick Johnson, Sujit Roy, Darryl W. Prater, Odell Causey, Joe E. Tillary, Wendell B. Powell, Anthony G. Sferlazza, Glenn S. Davis, Sr., Ryan Manning, Bianca Ward, Leonard S. Kenner, Eugene Collins, Demetrius Wilby, Terri L. Coleman, Hayes W. Richardson, Jr., Daron Williamson, Mukund Rao, William S. Tribe, Billy D. Dillon, Debra A. Holmes, Edwina Gibson, James Joseph, Gail L. Moore, Pat Sellars, John Davis, Bruce Goodrich, Denise V. Anthony, Cedrick P. Williams, Adrine M. Briggs, Albert Miller, Anthony Bell, Jahda Muhammad, O'Neil McCarthy, Doyle A. Bartholomew, Annette M. Sorapuru, Michael J. Dorsey, Sr., Frederico P. Cardiche, Gregory Carter, Dominique A. Lee, Paula M. Billy, Corey Howard, Johnathan M. Fields, Deborah Wooding, James S. Boudreaux, Travis A. Crawford, Joseph E. Roy, Sr., Ovaiona Domino, Amanda L. Robert, Valerie R. Moore, Luxeen Fremont, Oscar P. Garcia, Michael LaGarde, Artis Y. Domino, Enrique Miguel Johnson, Calvin W. Roddy, Derrick Frank, Jaquelin Ornelus, Weeks Marine, Inc., Clifford Hines, Michael Vial, Rudolph Price, III, Melvin C. Ainey, Willis R. Baptist, Jr., Eddie Simmons, Raham Williams, Edmond K. Bailey, Vernon J. Pratt, Jr., JaKobe Falls, Andrew Joseph, III, Janice M. Westerfield, Csilla Fekete, Jerome Williams, Jr., Manel Charles, Sherman J. Briggs, Sr., Marvin D. Mitchell, Gwendolyn F. Green, Dralanjala Overshown, Robert K. Whitaker, Jr., Melvin J. Smith, Renee Hubbard, Mark S. Tayamen, Sr., Ralph D. Taylor, Fred Alfred, Marshall Jackson, Jr., Isaac Henderson, Shannon R. Briggs, Wesley E. Boradbridge, Ashley N. Rome, Byron D. Alexander, Travis Alford, Chanette M. Westerfield, Latonya D. Smith, Adrien Sterling, Jospeh A. Ferrera, Sabu Watson, Raymond J. Savoy, Ronald Taylor, Davie Hooker, Josue Isbeck, Jeffrey M. Kelly, Melvin Hollins, Gayle Williams, Lawrence Garrett, Justin L. Overton, Gilbert Cotton, Darnell W. Lee, Lewis Rothell, Michael Hammond, Henry L. Bougere, Johnathan D. Holder, Ronald C. Hill, Milton Smith, Odlia Camille, Carmen Dorange, Meria Fremont, Wilbert Smith, Manas Mandal, Terry Thompson, Gour Gopal Das, Nehmiah Frank, Johnny W. Barrett, Shelete Ramsey, Sherman Calice, Oliver L. Bailey, Teresa Sanchez, Marie Sterling, Robert W. Harrison, Lawrence Bell, Carl McCloud, Melvin L. Thomas, Jason M. White, Dwayne A. Scott, Amanda B. Willis, Idomene J. Nicolas, New Orleans City, John G. Dillon, James R. Lee, Ruben E. Williams, Anita Richard, Carlton Young, Anata Shas-Das, Norman S. Brasly, Steven Jude Dinet, Sr., Michael D. Morrissey, Richard J. Huff, Gland E. Alfred, Dieumafaite Nicolas, Junius Royal, John Bavaret, Kim Powell, Connieyne Jackson, Ronald D. Singelton, Hillery Jackson, Philice M. Williams, Walter Leon Jenkins, Jr., David Elliot LeBlanc, Larry W. Craft, Cheryl S. Miller, Kenneth L. Hillard, Prosanta Guha, Sidney M. Givens, Robert Cockermam, Jr., William Conner, Edmond Joseph, Leonard J. Boylan and Henry Glover
Case Number: 2:2008cv04261
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46:0181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2014 Filing 25 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 2/3/2014; Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. USCA judge name: JOLLY, SOUTHWICK, HAYNES. (lag, )
September 28, 2012 Filing 24 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, Laurin Maritime (America) Inc., Laurin Maritime AB, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited against D.R.D. Towing Company, L.L.C. and the MV Mel Oliver, and D.R.D. and the MV Mel Oliver are liable to and shall pay respective stipulated recoverable damages, plus interest and costs, as set forth in record document number 1368 . All claims by D.R.D. against TINTOMARA interests and ACL are dismissed; All claims by D.R.D. for the benefit of limitation of liability are rejected and dismissed; All claims by TINTOMARA interests against ACL and all claims by ACL against TINTOMARA interests are dismissed; and All claims by John Bavaret are rejected and dismissed. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Reference: 08-4023, 08-4046, 08-4261, 08-4600)(ijg, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 23 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 9/1/11 as to #16 Notice of Appeal, #15 Notice of Appeal, #14 Notice of Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part and dismissed in part. USCA judge name: Higginbotham, Owen and Haynes. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1373). (mmv, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 22 Appeal Record Returned (original exhibits and/or non-electronic documents) from U.S. Court of Appeals: #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1372). (mmv, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 21 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 9/1/11 as to #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part and dismissed in part. USCA judge name: Higginbotham, Owen and Haynes. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1371). (mmv, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 20 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 1/21/2011 as to #18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is reversed and the cause is remanded for further proceedings; USCA judge name: KING, STEWART, OWEN. (lag, )
April 14, 2010 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM of USCA - the court has granted appellant's motions to reinstate these appeals re: #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited, Laurin Maritime AB, #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by American Commercial Lines LLC (plh, )
February 9, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by American Commercial Lines, Inc. (from Master Case, CA 08-4007, doc. no. 852). (lag, )
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of USCA dismissing #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, by Clerk. (lag, )
August 20, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL by DRD Towing Company, Inc.. (gec, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Laurin Maritime AB, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited, Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, Laurin Maritime (America) Inc. (master case 08-4007, doc #758). (gec, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL by American Commercial Lines LLC. (master case 08-4007, doc #757). (gec, )
June 15, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Laurin Maritime (America) Inc., Laurin Maritime AB, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited, Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited. (master case 08-4007, doc #729) (blg)
June 10, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by American Commercial Lines LLC, American Commercial Lines Inc. (lag, )
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L. R. Lemelle for all further proceedings. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk.(car, )
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Create association to 2:08-cv-04007-LMA-KWR as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk.(car, )
November 7, 2008 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Claim by David Elliot LeBlanc.(Whitmore, David)
October 10, 2008 Filing 8 Legal NOTICE of advertisement. (car, )
October 10, 2008 Filing 7 Legal NOTICE of advertisement. (car, )
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby for all further proceedings. Judge Eldon E. Fallon, Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/10/08.(dno, )
September 15, 2008 Filing 5 CLAIM AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint in Limitation of D.R.D. Towing Co., Inc. by American Commercial Lines LLC.(Goodier, Glenn)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER approving Ad Interim Stipulation, directing issuance of notice, and restraining prosecution of claims; Notice to file claims on or before 12/1/08. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/26/08. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants)(dno, )
August 22, 2008 Filing 3 AD INTERIM STIPULATION by DRD Towing Company, Inc. (dno, )
August 22, 2008 Filing 2 STIPULATION for costs by DRD Towing Company, Inc. (dno, )
August 22, 2008 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT-IN-LIMITATION (Filing fee $ 350) filed by DRD Towing Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dno, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: DRD Towing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steve Adams
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Randy White, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dedrick T. Lebeau
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fabian F. Zeringue
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sterling C. Anderson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Jackson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dorian Sippio
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Erica L. Boudreaux
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Frankcard Goodjoint, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Linda C. Davis
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Guatam Rumar Sau
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Crayton A. Martin
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Enos Jones
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dwayne V. Burrell
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kenneth Black
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephen Marshall Gabarick
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marco Hunt
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Regional Broussard
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wendell Bailey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rahjonae M. Briggs
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert E. Nelson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Elizabeth M. Dumas
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wayne A. Louviere
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hillary J. Prader
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lloyd J. Buchanan
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Russell L. Bradley
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Lang
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Henry Bass, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deanca W. Ward
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Glenn Stevenson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: American Commercial Lines LLC
Represented By: William P. Wynne
Represented By: Robert Taylor Lemon, II
Represented By: Glenn Gill Goodier
Represented By: Lance Michael Sannino
Represented By: Jean-Paul Abadie Escudier
Represented By: Richard D. Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carmen Dor Lornisca
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony J. Faulkin
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wayne Overton
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Horace R. Porter
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eddie Simons
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert W. Williams
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Keith N. Pickens
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ashis Halder
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eric R. Briggs
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ervin J. Broyard
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christopher A. Roberts
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Johnathan P. Morrissey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul A. Bordes
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul Dillon, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Albert L. Smith
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Craig Stieber
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Billy D. Cotton
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dayshawn M. Matthews
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Trudence Morgan
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Terry A. Banks
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Samuel J. Bijou
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Pravakar Digar
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James L. Guillot
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Terrell L. Pye
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Donnie D. Panerello
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Melvin A. Robinson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Richardson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John A. Jefferson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Warren Roberts
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Darre C. Finney
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gary McKenzie
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eugene Watson, III
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Peola O. Desdunes
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hugh J. Latulas
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Edmond Jose Joseph
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joseph J. Berrio
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Emmet Pembrook
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony Marrero
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dinnas Ratliff
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dieubon St. Juste
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deborah Bruce
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jeffery C. Champagne
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alfred Wilson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jackson N. Shenica
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Warren Dupar
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shawn M. Randolph
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Thomas L. Atkinson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nathan H. Scott
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Realious Claiborne
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Harry C. Sims, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gerald Foucha
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Donald Roberts
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Oles Chery
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eldridge E. Payton
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jean Pierre Louis
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Frederick Johnson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sujit Roy
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Darryl W. Prater
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Odell Causey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joe E. Tillary
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wendell B. Powell
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony G. Sferlazza
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Glenn S. Davis, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ryan Manning
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bianca Ward
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leonard S. Kenner
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eugene Collins
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Demetrius Wilby
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Terri L. Coleman
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hayes W. Richardson, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Daron Williamson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mukund Rao
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: William S. Tribe
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Billy D. Dillon
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Debra A. Holmes
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Edwina Gibson
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Joseph
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gail L. Moore
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Pat Sellars
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John Davis
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bruce Goodrich
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Denise V. Anthony
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cedrick P. Williams
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adrine M. Briggs
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Albert Miller
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony Bell
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jahda Muhammad
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: O'Neil McCarthy
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Doyle A. Bartholomew
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Annette M. Sorapuru
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael J. Dorsey, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Frederico P. Cardiche
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gregory Carter
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dominique A. Lee
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paula M. Billy
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Corey Howard
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Johnathan M. Fields
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deborah Wooding
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James S. Boudreaux
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Travis A. Crawford
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joseph E. Roy, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ovaiona Domino
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Amanda L. Robert
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Valerie R. Moore
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Luxeen Fremont
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Oscar P. Garcia
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael LaGarde
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Artis Y. Domino
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Enrique Miguel Johnson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Calvin W. Roddy
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Derrick Frank
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jaquelin Ornelus
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Weeks Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Wilton Ellwood Bland, III
Represented By: Jacques P. DeGruy
Represented By: Clarence William Emory
Represented By: Patrick E. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Clifford Hines
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Vial
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rudolph Price, III
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Melvin C. Ainey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Willis R. Baptist, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eddie Simmons
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Raham Williams
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Edmond K. Bailey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Vernon J. Pratt, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: JaKobe Falls
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Andrew Joseph, III
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Janice M. Westerfield
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Csilla Fekete
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jerome Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Manel Charles
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sherman J. Briggs, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marvin D. Mitchell
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gwendolyn F. Green
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dralanjala Overshown
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert K. Whitaker, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Melvin J. Smith
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Renee Hubbard
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mark S. Tayamen, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ralph D. Taylor
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fred Alfred
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marshall Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Isaac Henderson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shannon R. Briggs
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wesley E. Boradbridge
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ashley N. Rome
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Byron D. Alexander
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Travis Alford
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Chanette M. Westerfield
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Latonya D. Smith
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adrien Sterling
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jospeh A. Ferrera
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sabu Watson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Raymond J. Savoy
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ronald Taylor
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Davie Hooker
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Josue Isbeck
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jeffrey M. Kelly
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Melvin Hollins
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gayle Williams
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lawrence Garrett
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Justin L. Overton
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gilbert Cotton
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Darnell W. Lee
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lewis Rothell
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Hammond
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Henry L. Bougere
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Johnathan D. Holder
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ronald C. Hill
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Milton Smith
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Odlia Camille
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carmen Dorange
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Meria Fremont
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wilbert Smith
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Manas Mandal
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Terry Thompson
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gour Gopal Das
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nehmiah Frank
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Johnny W. Barrett
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shelete Ramsey
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sherman Calice
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Oliver L. Bailey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Teresa Sanchez
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marie Sterling
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert W. Harrison
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lawrence Bell
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carl McCloud
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Melvin L. Thomas
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jason M. White
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dwayne A. Scott
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Amanda B. Willis
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Idomene J. Nicolas
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Eraka W. DeLarge
Represented By: Robert J. Ellis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John G. Dillon
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James R. Lee
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ruben E. Williams
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anita Richard
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carlton Young
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anata Shas-Das
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Norman S. Brasly
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven Jude Dinet, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael D. Morrissey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Richard J. Huff
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gland E. Alfred
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dieumafaite Nicolas
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Junius Royal
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John Bavaret
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Gaudin
Represented By: Hilary Gerard Gaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kim Powell
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Connieyne Jackson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ronald D. Singelton
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hillery Jackson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Philice M. Williams
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Walter Leon Jenkins, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: David Elliot LeBlanc
Represented By: Joshua L. Rubenstein
Represented By: David Christopher Whitmore
Represented By: Lawrence Blake Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Larry W. Craft
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cheryl S. Miller
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kenneth L. Hillard
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Prosanta Guha
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sidney M. Givens
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Cockermam, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal |