Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, LLC v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Plaintiff: Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, LLC
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv04578
Filed: October 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Lafourche
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER AND REASONS denying 141 MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case ; or in the Alternative, for Transfer of Venue by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER AND REASONS - Defendant HIs motion for reconsideration is DENIED. Ruling on HIs motion to transfer is DEFERRED. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant HI submit additional briefing, not to exceed ten (10) pages, by November 24, 2014 on whether Atlantic Marine Construction Co. v. U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas33 applies and the timeliness of its motion to transfer. Plaintiff Bollinger may file a response by December 1, 2014, not to exceed ten (10) pages. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER & REASONS granting pla's 32 Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Stay; denying dft's 15 Motion to Stay Arbitration; denying without prejudice dft's 14 Motion to Dismiss Counts III-VIII of the Complaint; denying without prejudice dft's 17 Motion to Dismiss Counts I-II of the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/12/09. (rll, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, LLC v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, LLC
Represented By: Brent C. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?